Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hermann zu Wied

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note/Previous Titular See: (left the Church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1477Born
14 Mar 151538.1SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
13 Jun 151538.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
1518²40.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
22 Sep 153255.6AppointedAdministrator of Paderborn, Germany
16 Apr 154669.2ResignedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Feb 154770.1ResignedAdministrator of Paderborn, Germany
15 Aug 155275.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hermann zu Wied
Archbishop Hermann zu Wied (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBraunsberg

  • a bishop for 34.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • bd/ob/r/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,960
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1518, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 172, and Page 266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Jul 2021

Quantcast