Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Friedrich zu Wied

Deceased

Former Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1562AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Nov 1567ResignedArchbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
23 Dec 1568DiedFormer Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich zu Wied:
Priest Friedrich zu Wied (died ) Former Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013