Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ägidius Gelenius

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

Titular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1595BornKempen
16 Mar 161923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
29 Apr 165559.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
29 Apr 165559.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
25 Mar 165660.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
24 Aug 165661.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ägidius Gelenius:
Bishop Ägidius Gelenius (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 103
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015