Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Matthias Buchholz, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Shiqian [Shihtsien]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1903BornAachen, Germany
192218.7ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
7 Apr 192724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
10 Dec 193734.7AppointedPrefect of Shiqian [Shihtsien], China
198379.7ResignedPrefect of Shiqian [Shihtsien], China
12 Aug 199188.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Shiqian [Shihtsien], China

MicroData Summary for Matthias Buchholz:
Father Matthias Buchholz M.S.C. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Shiqian [Shihtsien]

  • a priest for 64.3 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015