Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dietrich von Hengebach

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1150¹Born
22 Dec 120858.9AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
24 May 120959.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
27 Mar 121262.2ResignedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
9 May 122474.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dietrich von Hengebach (VIAF: 81476096)
Archbishop Dietrich von Hengebach (born 1150, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,836
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 198

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 11 Jul 2020

Quantcast