Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hermann von Hessen

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

Bishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1442¹Born
11 Aug 148038.6SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
15 Nov 148038.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
4 Mar 148745.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
19 Mar 149553.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
4 Apr 149654.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
7 Mar 149856.2SucceededBishop of Paderborn, Germany
19 Oct 150866.8DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hermann von Hessen:
Archbishop Hermann von Hessen (died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a bishop for 21.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013