Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Petrus Verhorst

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

Titular Bishop of Alba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1657BornK÷ln
3 Feb 168628.9Ordained PriestPriest of K÷ln {Cologne}, Germany
24 Nov 168730.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
24 Nov 168730.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Alba
3 Apr 168831.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alba
10 Mar 170851.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Petrus Verhorst:
Bishop Johannes Petrus Verhorst (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

  • a priest for 22.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 75
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1688, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015