Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernst Tewes, C.O. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}

Titular Bishop of Villamagna in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1908BornEssen
16 Feb 193425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
193930.1ProfessedPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
3 Jul 196859.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
3 Jul 196859.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Villamagna in Proconsulari
14 Sep 196859.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Villamagna in Proconsulari
31 Jul 198475.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
16 Jan 199889.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ernst Tewes:
Bishop Ernst Tewes C.O. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013