Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Müller

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Sarepta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1845BornSievernich
30 Nov 186823.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
13 Mar 186923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
30 Apr 190357.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
30 Apr 190357.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
7 Jun 190357.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
21 Mar 192175.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Müller:
Bishop Joseph Müller (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 502
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013