Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Everhard Illigens

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Germanicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1851Born
9 Aug 187423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
28 Feb 190958.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
28 Feb 190958.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicia
28 Mar 190958.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicia
2 Jan 191462.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Everhard Illigens
Bishop Everhard Illigens (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünster

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast