Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Hubert Aloysius Voß (Voss)

Deceased

Bishop of Osnabrück

Pro-Vicar Apostolic of North German Missions {Germania Settentrionale}

Prefect of Schlewig-Holstein


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1841BornBorken
1 Feb 186624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
12 Apr 189957.4SelectedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
19 Jun 189957.6ConfirmedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
30 Aug 189957.8AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of North German Missions {Germania Settentrionale}
30 Aug 189957.8AppointedPrefect of Schlewig-Holstein, Germany
8 Oct 189957.9Ordained BishopBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
3 Mar 191472.3DiedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Hubert Aloysius Voß (Voss):
Bishop Heinrich Hubert Aloysius Voß (Voss) (born , died ) Bishop of Osnabrück

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 430

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015