Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Heinrich von Müllenark

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1190¹Born
15 Nov 122535.8AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
20 Sep 122636.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
26 Mar 123848.2DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Müllenark (VIAF: 6679232)
Archbishop Heinrich von Müllenark (born 1190, died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopMainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 198
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,028

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast