Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Weyland

Deceased

Bishop of Fulda, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1826Born
7 Jul 184822.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Limburg, Germany
6 Sep 184822.4Ordained PriestPriest of Limburg, Germany
4 Nov 188761.6SelectedBishop of Fulda, Germany
25 Nov 188761.6ConfirmedBishop of Fulda, Germany
25 Jan 188861.8Ordained BishopBishop of Fulda, Germany
11 Jan 189467.8DiedBishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Weyland (VIAF: 100413140)
Bishop Joseph Weyland (born , died ) Bishop of Fulda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHadamar, Diocese of Limburg
Ordained BishopFulda, Diocese of Fulda

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017