Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georg Ignaz Komp

Deceased

Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1828Born
12 Jun 185325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Fulda, Germany
27 Apr 189465.8SelectedBishop of Fulda, Germany
21 May 189465.9ConfirmedBishop of Fulda, Germany
25 Jul 189466.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fulda, Germany
21 Mar 189869.7SelectedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
24 Mar 189869.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
11 May 189869.9DiedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Ignaz Komp (VIAF: 55179874)
Archbishop Georg Ignaz Komp (born , died ) Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHammelburg, Diocese of Würzburg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Fulda, Diocese of Fulda

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017