Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Justus Knecht

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Neve (Nebo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1839Born
31 Dec 185516.2Converted
5 Aug 186222.8Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
4 Feb 189454.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
4 Feb 189454.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Neve (Nebo)
4 Apr 189454.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Neve (Nebo)
31 Jan 192181.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Justus Knecht (VIAF: 27817002)
Bishop Friedrich Justus Knecht (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruchsal, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau
Ordained BishopCathedral, Freiburg, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 405
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017