Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Marbach

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France

Titular Bishop of Paphus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1841Born
17 Dec 186423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
4 Jun 189149.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
4 Jun 189149.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Paphus
21 Jul 189149.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paphus
Sep 1901³59.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
17 Oct 191674.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Marbach
Bishop Charles Marbach (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeissenburg, Diocese of Strasbourg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Strasbourg, Diocese of Strasbourg

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 438
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jun 2017