Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto Raible, S.A.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kimberley in Western Australia

Titular Bishop of Anemurium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1887BornStuttgart, Germany
24 Sep 190719.8ProfessedMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
9 Jul 191123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
18 Jan 192840.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kimberley in Western Australia
18 Jun 193547.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kimberley in Western Australia
18 Jun 193547.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Anemurium
4 Aug 193547.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anemurium
12 Mar 195870.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Kimberley in Western Australia
18 Jun 196678.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kimberley in Western Australia

MicroData Summary for Otto Raible:
Bishop Otto Raible S.A.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kimberley in Western Australia

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013