Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf von Montfort (-Feldkirch)

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Mar 1322AppointedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
1 Oct 1322AppointedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
1 Oct 1322AppointedApostolic Administrator of Chur, Switzerland
1324¹Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
30 Jul 1325ResignedApostolic Administrator of Chur, Switzerland
27 Mar 1334DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rudolf von Montfort (-Feldkirch) (VIAF: 81624425)
Bishop Rudolf von Montfort (-Feldkirch) (died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a bishop for 10.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 204, and Page 219
  • b: CB, 16 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast