Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Georg Maria Lorenz Bossi

Deceased

Bishop of Chur-Sankt Gallen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1773BornMons
15 Apr 179723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Chur-Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
6 Apr 183561.6AppointedBishop of Chur-Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
5 Jul 183561.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chur-Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
9 Jan 184470.4DiedBishop of Chur-Sankt Gallen, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Johann Georg Maria Lorenz Bossi (VIAF: 311598176)
Bishop Johann Georg Maria Lorenz Bossi (born , died ) Bishop of Chur-Sankt Gallen

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 169
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1835, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Aug 2016