Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas von Planta

Deceased

Bishop of Chur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1520BornZuoz
21 Dec 154929.0SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
19 Mar 155029.2ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
10 Oct 155130.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
28 Apr 156544.4DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Thomas von Planta:
Bishop Thomas von Planta (born , died ) Bishop of Chur

  • a bishop for 13.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 183
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,920

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Jan 2014