Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ortlieb Brandis

Deceased

Bishop of Chur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1430¹Born
30 May 145828.4SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
31 Jul 145828.5ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
27 Mar 146333.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
25 Jul 149161.5DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ortlieb Brandis (VIAF: 86137781)
Bishop Ortlieb Brandis (born 1430, died ) Bishop of Chur

  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 141
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 16,990
  • b/c2: AT, 19 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016