Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Hans Urs von Balthasar

Deceased

Priest of Chur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1905BornLucerne, Switzerland
26 Jul 193933.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Feb 195650.4IncardinatedPriest of Chur, Switzerland
26 Jun 198882.8DiedPriest of Chur, Switzerland
28 Jun 198882.8Elevated to CardinalDied Before Publication
28 Jun 198882.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Hans Urs von Balthasar
Father Hans Urs von Balthasar (born , died ) Priest of Chur

  • a priest for 48.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 23 Jun 2016