Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Bertieri, O.A.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1734BornCeva
24 Sep 175722.8Ordained PriestPriest of Agostiniani Scalzi
18 Jun 178954.6SelectedBishop of Como, Italy
14 Dec 178955.0ConfirmedBishop of Como, Italy
3 Jan 179055.1Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
17 Oct 179156.9SelectedBishop of Pavia, Italy
26 Mar 179257.3ConfirmedBishop of Pavia, Italy
15 Jul 180469.6DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bertieri
Bishop Giuseppe Bertieri O.A.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Pavia

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 176, and Page 328
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016