Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Maria Maggioli, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Savona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1752BornGenova
12 Nov 177522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Sep 179542.7AppointedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
27 Sep 179542.8Ordained BishopBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
24 Sep 180451.7AppointedBishop of Savona, Italy
19 Jan 182067.1DiedBishop of Savona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria Maggioli
Bishop Vincenzo Maria Maggioli O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Savona

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 269, and Page 302
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016