Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Vincent Dombideau de Crouseilhes

Deceased

Bishop of Quimper


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1751BornPau
23 Dec 177524.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 180553.5SelectedBishop of Quimper, France
22 Mar 180553.7ConfirmedBishop of Quimper, France
21 Apr 180553.8Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper, France
28 Jun 182371.9DiedBishop of Quimper, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Vincent Dombideau de Crouseilhes:
Bishop Pierre-Vincent Dombideau de Crouseilhes (born , died ) Bishop of Quimper

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013