Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Basil (Herman) Heiser, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Minister General Emeritus of Order of Friars Minor Conventual


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1909Born
18 Jul 192617.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
11 Feb 193021.1Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
24 Jan 193223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
4 Jun 196051.4AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
20 May 197263.3CeasedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
21 Nov 197263.8AppointedUnder Secretary of the Congregation for Religious and Secular Institutes
19 Dec 198475.9RetiredUnder Secretary of the Congregation for Religious and Secular Institutes
12 Jan 2009100.0DiedMinister General Emeritus of Order of Friars Minor Conventual

MicroData Summary for Basil (Herman) Heiser
Father Basil (Herman) Heiser O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Minister General Emeritus of Order of Friars Minor Conventual

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerre Haute, IN, USA
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Our Lady of Consolation Province, Cemetery, Mount St. Francis, IN

  • a priest for 76.9 years

Source(s):
  • usec/loc: CB, 9 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast