Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Paolo Brunoni

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1807Born
1830¹22.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 185346.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria
12 Jul 185346.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tharona
17 Jul 185346.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tharona
25 Jun 186861.0AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
2 Jan 187769.5DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Brunoni
Patriarch Paolo Brunoni (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLarnaca, Archdiocese of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
Ordained BishopPropaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1870
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 107, and Page 536
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1853, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016