Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente (a S. Theresia) Manzini, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cuneo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1803Born
11 Mar 182622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
13 Jun 184339.8SelectedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
22 Jan 184440.4ConfirmedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
12 Feb 184440.4InstalledBishop of Cuneo, Italy
25 Feb 184440.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cuneo, Italy
21 Mar 186561.5DiedBishop of Cuneo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Clemente (a S. Theresia) Manzini (VIAF: 89285414)
Bishop Clemente (a S. Theresia) Manzini O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Cuneo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassello
Ordained BishopSte Marie de la Victoire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 169
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast