Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolaus Murad

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1799BornMonte Libano, Lebanon
9 Oct 184344.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
5 Nov 184344.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
26 Dec 186263.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Murad (VIAF: 61376396)
Archbishop Nicolaus Murad (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 230
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1843, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016