Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Agostino Salomoni, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuneo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1800BornPezzetti
15 Mar 182322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
4 Feb 184039.4SelectedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
27 Apr 184039.6ConfirmedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
3 May 184039.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cuneo, Italy
26 Jul 184039.9InstalledBishop of Cuneo, Italy
3 Aug 184342.9ResignedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
1 Jul 187473.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuneo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Agostino Salomoni
Bishop Giuseppe Agostino Salomoni C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuneo

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 169
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1840, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016