Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Odone

Deceased

Bishop of Susa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1794BornOviglio
20 Sep 181723.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 184551.1SelectedBishop of Susa, Italy
24 Apr 184551.2ConfirmedBishop of Susa, Italy
4 May 184551.2Ordained BishopBishop of Susa, Italy
9 Nov 186672.7DiedBishop of Susa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Odone (VIAF: 89330838)
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Odone (born , died ) Bishop of Susa

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016