Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Buglione di Monale

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1817Born
19 Dec 184023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saluzzo, Italy
27 Oct 187154.0AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
19 Nov 187154.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
24 Jun 189476.6DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Buglione di Monale
Bishop Alfonso Buglione di Monale (born , died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaluzzo, Diocese of Saluzzo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saluzzo, Diocese of Saluzzo

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,048
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 495
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1871, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017