Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrico Gajo, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1811Born
1829¹17.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Mar 183322.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Feb 183423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Jul 187261.4AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
22 Sep 187261.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
31 Jan 188068.9DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrico Gajo
Bishop Enrico Gajo O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Bobbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarignano, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopSt. Philip, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 151
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1872, Number 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Mar 2017