Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Mascaretti, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Susa, Italy

Bishop of Zama Major


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1824Born
29 Apr 184520.8ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
20 Mar 184722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
23 Feb 187247.6AppointedBishop of Susa, Italy
14 Apr 187247.8Ordained BishopBishop of Susa, Italy
31 Dec 187753.5ResignedBishop of Susa, Italy
25 Nov 188763.4AppointedBishop of Zama Major
11 Nov 189470.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Susa, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Federico Mascaretti
Bishop Federico Mascaretti O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Susa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePianello Val Tidone, Diocese of Piacenza
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,335
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 508, and Page 601
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Mar 2017