Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Giuseppe Antonio Cavalleri, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1764BornCarmagnola
22 Sep 178722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Jul 183267.7AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
26 Aug 183267.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
8 Aug 183671.8DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giuseppe Antonio Cavalleri
Bishop Giovanni Giuseppe Antonio Cavalleri O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Bobbio

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Jul 2016