Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Greco

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1775BornCatanzaro
15 Mar 179924.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 182449.2SelectedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
3 May 182449.3ConfirmedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
9 May 182449.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
22 Feb 184065.1DiedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Greco:
Bishop Felice Greco (born , died ) Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013