Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Constantini

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1794BornCosenza
21 Dec 181622.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 183742.7SelectedBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
19 May 183742.8ConfirmedBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
25 Jun 183742.9Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
19 Jan 185257.5DiedBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Constantini:
Bishop Giovanni Constantini (born , died ) Bishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013