Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Bombini

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1775BornCosenza
12 Jun 180226.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 182953.5SelectedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
21 May 182953.6ConfirmedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
24 May 182953.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
18 Jan 187195.3DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Bombini:
Bishop Michele Bombini (born , died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

  • a priest for 68.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013