Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Narni Mancinelli

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1772BornNola
5 Apr 179422.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Feb 179522.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 181845.9SelectedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
6 Apr 181846.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
12 Apr 181846.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
5 Dec 183159.6SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Caserta, Italy
24 Feb 183259.9ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Caserta, Italy
17 Apr 184876.0DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Narni Mancinelli
Archbishop Domenico Narni Mancinelli (born , died ) Bishop of Caserta

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 138, and Page 171
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1818, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 3 May 2016