Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel-Laurent Paillou(x)

Deceased

Bishop of La Rochelle, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1735Born
17 Dec 180469.7SelectedBishop of La Rochelle, France
1 Feb 180569.9ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle, France
2 Feb 180569.9Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle, France
15 Dec 182691.7DiedBishop of La Rochelle, France

MicroData Summary for Gabriel-Laurent Paillou(x)
Bishop Gabriel-Laurent Paillou(x) (born , died ) Bishop of La Rochelle

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuybelliard

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 327
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1805, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018