Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Mansi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Otranto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1746BornLojano
16 Dec 176519.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
22 Sep 177024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Mar 181871.5SelectedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
6 Apr 181871.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
12 Apr 181871.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
1 Mar 183285.5DiedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Mansi:
Archbishop Andrea Mansi O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Otranto

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1833
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013