Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Ferrari, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1761Born
23 Jan 178524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Apr 181958.2SelectedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
4 Jun 181958.3ConfirmedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
6 Jun 181958.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
22 Mar 182463.1SelectedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
3 May 182463.2ConfirmedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
4 May 182867.2DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Ferrari
Bishop Vincenzo Ferrari O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,822
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,828
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 231, and Page 261
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,819, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast