Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist Judas Thaddeus von Keller

Deceased

Bishop of Rottenburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1774BornSalem
10 Jun 179723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
22 Jul 181642.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
22 Jul 181642.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Evaria
4 Aug 181642.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Evaria
28 Jan 182853.7AppointedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
20 May 182854.0InstalledBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
17 Oct 184571.4DiedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Judas Thaddeus von Keller:
Bishop Johann Baptist Judas Thaddeus von Keller (born , died ) Bishop of Rottenburg

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 190, and Page 326

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013