Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Jakob Humann

Deceased

Bishop of Mainz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1771BornStrasbourg, France
21 May 179625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
16 Jul 183362.2SelectedBishop of Mainz, Germany
20 Jan 183462.7ConfirmedBishop of Mainz, Germany
11 Jun 183463.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mainz, Germany
19 Aug 183463.3DiedBishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Jakob Humann:
Bishop Johann Jakob Humann (born , died ) Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013