Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Heinrich (Karl Josef) Schmid, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1801Born
22 Oct 182019.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Sep 182423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Apr 184645.1AppointedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
28 Dec 187473.8DiedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Heinrich (Karl Josef) Schmid
Abbot Heinrich (Karl Josef) Schmid O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Maria Einsiedeln

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaar
Death PlaceEinsiedeln

  • a priest for 50.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast