Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Maria Alvisini

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1757³BornBocchignano
11 Mar 178023.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 180850.9AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
24 Jan 180850.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
31 Aug 182366.5DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Maria Alvisini:
Bishop Giulio Maria Alvisini (born , died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 197

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013