Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro-Paolo Presicce, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1763BornNardo
17 Jun 178724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
31 Dec 181855.5SelectedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
29 Mar 181955.8ConfirmedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
12 Apr 181955.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
12 Jan 183874.5DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro-Paolo Presicce
Bishop Pietro-Paolo Presicce O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Tricarico

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 376
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 May 2016