Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Zollio

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1760Born
20 Sep 178322.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 182261.9AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
6 Oct 182261.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
24 May 182463.6AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
2 Apr 183271.4DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Zollio
Bishop Ottavio Zollio (born , died ) Bishop of Rimini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte Gridolfo

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 89, and Page 308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1822, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018