Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Caldora

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Venosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1759Born
20 Sep 178324.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 181858.7SelectedBishop of Venosa, Italy
26 Jun 181858.7ConfirmedBishop of Venosa, Italy
28 Jun 181858.7Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
10 Dec 182566.2ResignedBishop of Venosa, Italy
1827¹67.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Venosa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Caldora
Bishop Nicola Caldora (born , died 1827) Bishop Emeritus of Venosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 392
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1818, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018