Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Ignazio Marolda, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1770³BornMuro Lucano
15 Aug 178515.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Jan 179322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
10 Jan 182251.7SelectedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
19 Apr 182252.0ConfirmedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
21 Apr 182252.0Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
1 Jan 183766.7SelectedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
19 May 183767.1ConfirmedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
15 Mar 184271.9DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Ignazio Marolda:
Bishop Pietro Ignazio Marolda C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Pozzuoli

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 254, and Page 315
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013